HUTTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1044141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Social & Educational support for the pupils of Hutton Church of England Grammar School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 22 September 2023

Total income: £12,906
Total expenditure: £9,996

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HGSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Livingstone Chair 21 September 2022
None on record
Ian Greenhalgh Trustee 21 September 2022
HUTTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Patricia Gilmore Trustee 02 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/09/2019 22/09/2020 22/09/2021 22/09/2022 22/09/2023
Total gross income £3.57k £3.01k £1.51k £2.49k £12.91k
Total expenditure £2.60k £1.73k £3.44k £5.18k £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.10k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 September 2023 22 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 22 September 2022 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 22 September 2021 28 October 2022 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 22 September 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 22 September 2019 10 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hutton Grammar School
Liverpool Road
Hutton
PRESTON
PR4 5SN
Phone:
01772613112
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available