THE ROTARY CLUB OF EAST GRINSTEAD MERIDIAN TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds for the general assisstance of both local,regional and international needy groups and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- East Sussex
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 13 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Ann King | Chair | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Norman King | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ELLIS | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS SMITH | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Martin Craddock | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.46k | £15.48k | £28.64k | £21.98k | £21.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.52k | £14.90k | £27.31k | £28.13k | £23.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE INSTITUTION SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE, EAST GRINSTEAD FOREST ROW LINGFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
COURT HOUSE COTTAGE
SCHOOL LANE
NUTLEY
UCKFIELD
TN22 3PG
- Phone:
- 01825713879
- Email:
- info@meridianrotary.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window