CHAPELBREAK PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school for children under 5 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Oldham
Governance
- 17 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY ATKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Louise Courtenay Smith | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Thurlow | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2019 | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.64k | £144.76k | £131.97k | £136.74k | £149.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.93k | £128.16k | £127.35k | £133.64k | £138.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 06 April 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 06 April 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BOWTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chapel Break Village Hall
Harpsfield
Bowthorpe
Norwich
NR5 9LG
- Phone:
- 01603 442059
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window