HARROW SHOPMOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harrow Shopmobility is a mobility service loaning out electric or manual wheelchairs and scooters for day use. We hire out wheelchairs, travel scooters and walkers for longer term use. The Service is free for day use and open to people with limited mobility, whether permanent or temporary. The scheme is available to all and is based in Harrow,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Harrow
Governance
- 14 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Madu Vyas | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andre Edgar | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dee Webster | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN SMITH | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS GABRIELLE VICTORIA BRANCH | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Esla Rena Cambridge | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.44k | £15.93k | £10.42k | £22.91k | £17.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.02k | £20.93k | £23.96k | £31.42k | £28.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.01k | £5.00k | £14.96k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 1999, 13 MARCH 2000 , 14 SEPTEMBER 2005, 12 JULY 2006 AND 13 JUNE 2007 as amended on 26 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO HELP PERSONS WITH SENSORY OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES IN HARROW IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING TRAINED ESCORTS WHEELCHAIRS OR OTHER EQUIPMENT WITHOUT MONETARY CHARGE FOR THE DURATION OF THEIR SHOPPING VISIT
Area of benefit
HARROW
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARROW SHOPMOBILITY
37 ST. GEORGES SHOPPING & LEISURE
CENTRE
ST. ANNS ROAD
HARROW
HA1 1HS
- Phone:
- 02084271200
- Email:
- harrowshopmobility@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window