Financial history WESTDALE JUNIOR SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1044177
Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.99k £5.32k £1.13k £2.53k £102
Total expenditure £4.58k £15.78k £1.94k £517 £94
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A