FRIENDS OF BARFORD CP SCHOOL

Charity number: 1044206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £6,307
Total expenditure: £3,222

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Snow Chair 28 January 2019
None on record
Dr Beth Hall-Thompson Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Carrie Truman Trustee 02 November 2023
None on record
Rebecca Ritchie Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
Bryony Barrett Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Sheila Pym Trustee 28 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.56k £1.90k £5.28k £7.60k £6.31k
Total expenditure £8.56k £8.25k £8.15k £15.92k £3.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Barford Primary School
Chapel Street
Barford
NORWICH
NR9 4AB
Phone:
01603 759 660
Website:

No information available