ST JOHN THE BAPTIST'S CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various projects to maintain the historic importance of the building fabric of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
Governance
- 15 February 1995: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST JOHN (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Jones | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Majorie Jones | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
TONY MARTIN | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARGARET SUZANNE GROVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBBIE LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.67k | £1.09k | £1.15k | £1.96k | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54k | £36 | £5 | £336 | £67 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED DATED 23 JANUARY 1995.
Charitable objects
A.RESTORATION PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE BEAUTIFICATION RECONSTRUCTION OF FABRIC OF ST JOHN'S CHURCH, DITTON PRIORS SHROPSHIRE AND INCLUDING THE GRAVEYARD AND GROUNDS,MONUMENTS,FITTINGS,FIXTURES,STAINED GLASS AND FURNITURE IN THE CHURCH BUT NOT TO INCLUDE GARDENING,MOWING AND KEEPING TIDY THE CHURCHYARD AND GRAVEYARD. B.FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE SAID COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE TO PRESERVE,REPAIR,MAINTAIN,IMPROVE,BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT THE CHURCH CHURCHYARD AND GRAVEYARD.
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VIXENS
VICARAGE ROAD
DITTON PRIORS
BRIDGNORTH
WV16 6SP
- Phone:
- 01746712395
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window