Accounts and annual returns LITTLE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (INGHAM)

Charity number: 1044210
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 11 June 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 11 June 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 July 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 12 July 2023 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 February 2022 256 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 February 2022 256 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 September 2020 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 October 2020 139 days late Download Open in new window