Financial history WELBOURN WONDERBUGS PRESCHOOL

Charity Number: 1044232
Charity reporting is up to date (199 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £37.23k £31.99k £31.85k £59.00k £67.00k
Total expenditure £33.70k £38.36k £29.70k £46.00k £57.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A