Financial history SOUTHWICK NEIGHBOURHOOD YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1044254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £110.69k £819.50k £378.70k £373.36k £371.41k
Total expenditure £120.55k £123.32k £337.15k £450.45k £293.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.05k £81.01k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £114.68k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £663.75k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £123.32k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A