COMMUNITY BIBLE STUDY INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1044255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We develop and publish Christian Bible study notes and commentaries and other teaching materials pertaining to the Bible on the pattern established by Community Bible Study International and establish and promote non-denominational Bible study classes utilising these materials

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £43,727
Total expenditure: £44,339

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CBSI UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Elizabeth Bagg Chair 01 March 2020
None on record
Richard Charles Alvarez Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Michelle Toby Smith Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Stuart Crossley Trustee 12 November 2016
LEICESTER WEST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Simon Charles de Chair Baker Trustee 12 March 2016
None on record
Paul Michael Hudson Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £340.45k £303.93k £205.17k £26.48k £43.73k
Total expenditure £324.23k £280.45k £183.10k £26.88k £44.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37 LOWFIELDS DRIVE
YORK
YO24 3DQ
Phone:
01904339746