Accounts and annual returns OPERA DELLA LUNA

Charity number: 1044260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 11 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 11 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 24 May 2024 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 24 May 2024 85 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 08 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 16 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 March 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 02 March 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window