Financial history OPERA DELLA LUNA

Charity number: 1044260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £75.19k £12.31k £75.82k £119.21k £130.42k
Total expenditure £79.10k £15.46k £51.75k £129.52k £73.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £21.16k £500 N/A