HEXHAM THE SELE FIRST SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds for the Selefirst School by holding events at school for parents and children to attend

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £15,954
Total expenditure: £28,168

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SELE SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Middling Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Brooke Phillips Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Rachel Jayne Currie Trustee 07 March 2022
None on record
Rebecca McVittie Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
SeleFirst School Trustee 01 September 2000
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £23.75k £12.64k £12.02k £14.37k £15.95k
Total expenditure £24.21k £18.64k £5.91k £10.70k £28.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 November 2020 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sele First School
The Sele
Hexham
NE46 3QZ
Phone:
01434602808