HAVEN HOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1044296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Care for life threatened/limited children and young people and their families, through providing: * Respite care: day care and overnight stays * Palliative care at end of life * Bereavement suite and support * Community and hospice at home services: Physio, Music therapy, Toy loan, Special yoga * Family Support: Siblings, Counselling, Family Suite and Training to equip parents

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Hertfordshire
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1995: Standard registration
  • 07 May 2013: Funds received from 1051621 THE BRADEN WEBSTER MEMORIAL CHARITY
  • 20 July 2020: Funds received from 1096891 ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT PARENTS ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Ailles Chair 30 June 2020
SAFER TOURISM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RSA (THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF ARTS, MANUFACTURES AND COMMERCE)
Received: On time
THE CITY AND GUILDS OF LONDON INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Ruquyya Vankad Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Hugh Thompson Trustee 08 August 2024
None on record
Dr Charlotte Clements Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Dr Charitha Dilini Rajapakse Trustee 12 December 2023
None on record
Deirdre Alice Mullner Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
William Benjamin Cooke Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Lucy Louise Lillian Mavers Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Stuart Anthony Rose Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Liesbeth Anne Rubinstein-Newman Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Simon Atwell Boston Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Rachel Clare Brodie Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
Ghislaine Stephenson Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.69m £5.21m £4.48m £5.32m £5.77m
Total expenditure £4.54m £4.05m £4.41m £5.18m £5.94m
Income from government contracts £506.76k £644.45k £686.82k £705.20k £1.23m
Income from government grants £398.58k £1.34m £479.81k £1.13m £658.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.43m £3.06m £2.23m £1.54m £1.91m
Income - Other trading activities £1.14m £380.58k £966.39k £1.61m £1.74m
Income - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.74m £1.24m £2.11m £2.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £35.10k £31.21k £39.74k £55.82k £85.66k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £254.81k £528.26k £47.58k £137.74k £484.68k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.82m £2.62m £2.84m £3.35m £3.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.72m £1.43m £1.58m £1.83m £2.08m
Expenditure - Governance £14.54k £14.59k £14.20k £36.75k £32.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £8.95k £9.10k £12.77k £11.47k £10.03k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.76m £1.70m £1.81m £1.70m £1.66m
Long-term investments £1.12m £1.83m £1.91m £1.80m £1.99m
Other assets £1.03m £1.84m £1.75m £2.02m £1.79m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £370.39k £353.38k £319.24k £402.20k £339.91k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE WHITE HOUSE
HIGH ROAD
WOODFORD GREEN
IG8 9LB
Phone:
02085059944
Website:

havenhouse.org.uk