LEARNING DISABILITY CANNOCK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide social and leisure activities for people with learning difficulties living in Cannock and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 17 February 1995: Standard registration
- PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF THE ERIC ROBERTS CENTRE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET BULLOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Karen Ann Gentles | Trustee | 03 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY MARLENE BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET LYNN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £953 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £328 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.38k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £822 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/01/1995 AS AMENDED ON 01/05/2014 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/04/2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THOSE PERSONS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES/SPECIAL NEEDS IN THE CANNOCK CHASE AND SURROUNDING AREA. (2) TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES/SPECIAL NEEDS IN THE CANNOCK CHASE AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 HEDNESFORD ROAD
HEATH HAYES
CANNOCK
WS12 3EA
- Phone:
- 01543276271
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window