DULWICH VILLAGE INFANTS' SCHOOL PARENT - TEACHER - FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1044321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the pupils in the school. It may: A Develop relationships between the staff, parents and other school associates. B Engage in activities which support the school and advance its pupils' education. C Provide educational facilities or items (not provided from statutory funds) as the Committee in consultation with the Governing body shall determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £61,153
Total expenditure: £47,842

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DULWICH VILLAGE INFANTS' SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
  • DULWICH VILLAGE INFANTS' SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER - FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
  • DULWICH VILLAGE INFANTS' SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bridie Cox Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Katharine Anne Purser Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Johanna Wilson Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Jonathan Cliffe Taylor Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Bryony Jane Gilhooly Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
HELEN POYTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £38.67k £43.27k £34.06k £87.43k £61.15k
Total expenditure £34.36k £15.91k £5.72k £60.54k £47.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dulwich Village C Of E Infant School
Dulwich Village
LONDON
SE21 7BU
Phone:
020 7525 9233
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available