SWANSEA PHILHARMONIC CHOIR

Charity number: 1044347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To perform choral works in a wide variety of styles but not necessarily to the exclusion of other types of musical activities The Choir shall not engage in competition

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £31,335
Total expenditure: £24,310

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Carmarthenshire
  • City Of Swansea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Hook Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Hazel Phillips Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Ruth Ridge Trustee 01 September 2021
THE GOWER SOCIETY
Received: On time
CATRIN ALUN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £51.97k £31.78k £899 £4.23k £31.34k
Total expenditure £46.89k £23.39k £803 £5.08k £24.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 15 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 01 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 14 November 2019 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 GOLWG Y MYNYDD
CRAIG-CEFN-PARC
SWANSEA
SA6 5RF
Phone:
01792 845843
Website:

swanseaphilchoir.org