TRENT VINEYARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
God has called us to build a biblical, growing, & diverse church in Nottingham, which will, in a creative & contemporary way, in the power of the Holy Spirit, worship God & communicate the gospel with compassion and generosity. We aim to make, train, & equip disciples to be effective in the extending of God's Kingdom, to develop leaders, to plant new churches, & to contribute to the body of Christ
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£3,849,506
Donations and legacies | £2.60m | |
Charitable activities | £196.35k | |
Other trading activities | £1.03m | |
Investments | £24.27k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,149,906
Raising funds | £745.94k | |
Charitable activities | £3.40m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £745.94k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.40m |
People

129 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
1000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 20 February 1995: Standard registration
- TRENT VINEYARD, NOTTINGHAM (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE SILLITO | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
John Bodily | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jessica Joyce Woodliffe | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
Michael Peter Yanney | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Samuel James Dunlop | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Paul Tomkins | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.37m | £3.22m | £3.26m | £3.76m | £3.85m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22m | £3.10m | £3.47m | £4.03m | £4.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £243.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.59m | £2.85m | £2.54m | £2.60m | £2.60m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £641.60k | £184.64k | £564.57k | £1.00m | £1.03m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £137.50k | £184.16k | £152.94k | £155.12k | £196.35k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.40k | £355 | £596 | £5.67k | £24.27k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £628 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.64m | £2.91m | £3.06m | £3.32m | £3.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £187.70k | £410.96k | £715.82k | £745.94k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £66.40k | £0 | £74.90k | £77.54k | £103.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £583.70k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.93m | £7.74m | £7.53m | £7.30m | £7.02m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £1.66m | £1.80m | £1.91m | £1.73m | £1.51m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | -£16.46k | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.67m | £1.51m | £1.61m | £1.47m | £1.26m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 1995. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 3 JANUARY 1997 AND 4 MARCH 2004 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 JANUARY 2007 AND 26 MARCH 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
(A) THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR PUBLIC EDUCATION; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING MISSIONARY ACTIVITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND ALSO INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PLANTING OF NEW CHURCHES AND ORGANISATIONS OF CONGREGATIONS; (C) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY; (D) THE RELIEF OF THE SICK AND ELDERLY; (E) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES AND INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trent Vineyard
Unit 1
Easter Park
Lenton Lane
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 2PX
- Phone:
- 01159887060
- Email:
- connect@trentvineyard.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window