TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (NEWCASTLE)

Charity number: 1044379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public courses and other events in meditation and Buddhism, guiding and supporting those who wish to follow the Buddhist religion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £21,768
Total expenditure: £15,955

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gateshead
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • North Tyneside
  • Northumberland
  • South Tyneside
  • Sunderland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEWCASTLE BUDDHIST CENTRE (Working name)
  • NEWCASTLE BUDDHIST CENTRE F W B O (Working name)
  • FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER (NEWCASTLE) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nandavajra XXX Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Steven Graham Dellow Trustee 06 April 2021
None on record
Peter Cowen Trustee 04 April 2017
None on record
Lynne Thompson Campbell Trustee 29 September 2015
None on record
Norman Powell Trustee 23 January 2014
None on record
RICHARD DELL Trustee 12 March 2013
None on record
John Wigham Trustee 01 January 1999
None on record
MS SRADDHAMANI BENSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £34.05k £25.25k £16.39k £50.10k £21.77k
Total expenditure £10.80k £5.93k £8.41k £11.21k £15.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 April 2024 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 May 2024 204 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Newcastle Buddhist Centre
187 Westgate Road
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE4 6AA
Phone:
01914472860