THE CHERNOBYL RELIEF FOUNDATION IN THE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivery of goods and clothing to affected children.Arranging holidays for their health and respite care for their families. Arranging concerts and talks.Providing hospital equipment and medical aid Arranging special service to mark Anniversary of the disaster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Ukraine
Governance
- 22 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAPTAIN C W PILE ROYAL NAVY | Chair | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
MS Tetyana Pereverzeva BIRCH | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
BARONESS of Queensbury CAROLINE COX | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
THE EMBASSY OF UKRAINE | Trustee | 12 March 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300 | £0 | £175 | £0 | £8.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £928 | £0 | £400 | £246 | £988 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 December 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE AND PURSUANCE OF RELIEF OF POVERTY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN UKRAINE AND ELSEWHERE WHO HAVE SUFFERED AND ARE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF THE DISASTER WHICH OCCURRED IN 1986 AT CHERNOBYL NUCLEAR POWER STATION IN UKRAINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 IBSTONE AVENUE
BRADWELL COMMON
MILTON KEYNES
MK13 8BA
- Phone:
- 01908388529
- Email:
- birch.t@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window