LITTLE EXPLORERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1044412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide Early Years Care and Education for children aged 2 years to School age. We are based in South Shropshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £80,881
Total expenditure: £85,358

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BURWARTON PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
  • BURWARTON PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLER GROUP (Previous name)
  • BURWARTON PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLER GROUP (Previous name)
  • BURWARTON PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLERS (Previous name)
  • BURWEARTON PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLERS (Previous name)
  • LITTLE EXPLORERS PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amy Mason Trustee 31 January 2025
None on record
Kerri-Ann Sherry Trustee 07 January 2025
None on record
Laura FURNISS Trustee 06 June 2023
BROCKTON PRE-SCHOOL
Charity reporting is overdue by 1802 days
Rebecca Cashmore Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Cheryl Everton Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Stephanie Allen Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Julie Pinches Trustee 09 May 2018
None on record
Wendy Lloyd Trustee 24 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £110.11k £137.10k £86.61k £88.51k £80.88k
Total expenditure £86.04k £98.75k £142.43k £83.97k £85.36k
Income from government contracts N/A £104.46k £57.35k £62.48k £64.32k
Income from government grants N/A £200 £1.50k £4.31k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Station Road
Ditton Priors
WV16 6SS
Phone:
01746787549