2ND MALVERN SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
2nd Malvern Scout Group consists of four sections, a Beaver colony, a Cub pack, and two Scout troops, each meeting once a week to carry out various fun, educational and adventurous activities associated with the Scout movement. Our main purpose is to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 21 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Charles Reeve | Chair | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Andrew Johnstone | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL ADRIAN WOOD | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Wood | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Verena Steventon | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.93k | £27.37k | £29.81k | £33.30k | £34.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.72k | £22.98k | £25.89k | £36.70k | £34.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Association
2nd Malvern Scout Group
Spring Lane
MALVERN
WR14 1AJ
- Phone:
- 01684 565883
- Email:
- chair@2ndmalvernscouts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window