UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (SOUTH EAST LONDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
U3A (S.E. London) advances the education of older people no longer in employment in S.E. London. We provide recreational activities and facilities for these with the object of improving people's interest in, and enjoyment of life. We are a self-help group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 25 February 1995: Standard registration
- U3A - SOUTH EAST LONDON (Working name)
- UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (SOUTH LONDON) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Williamson | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rod Press | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
William Barry | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Weir | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gina Raggett | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Lobo | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Melville | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Crossley | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Serebriakoff | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.89k | £21.25k | £13.08k | £13.63k | £15.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.42k | £28.42k | £12.90k | £17.23k | £20.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 17 APRIL 1994 AND 25 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, SOUTH EAST LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Pagoda Gardens
London
SE3 0UX
- Phone:
- 07790181729
- Email:
- u3aselsec@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window