Financial history PLATFORM (LONDON)

Charity Number: 1044485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £462.52k £719.75k £654.26k £958.03k £841.68k
Total expenditure £461.21k £652.45k £771.41k £939.37k £810.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £4.69k £40.19k £9.74k £836.67k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £714.03k £614.03k £947.66k £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £1.03k £48 £627 £5.01k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £618.45k £749.41k £877.80k £810.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £34.00k £22.00k £61.57k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.48k £7.76k £7.90k £10.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0