BRISTOL COMMUNITY CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity are: Preaching and teaching the christian faith Helping local families though counselling, play therapy and other support, regardless of their beliefs Fundraising for our projects and those we support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 February 1995: Standard registration
- AID INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- BOURNE FAMILY PROJECT (Working name)
- BRISTOL COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ROBERT WELLINGTON | Chair | 20 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Peggy Cullimore | Trustee | 20 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK TIMOTHY SOUTHALL | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATRINA NANCY LAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH OCTOBER 1994, AS AMENDED 12TH JULY 1995
Charitable objects
(A)THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (B)THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bourne Chapel
Waters Road
Kingwood
Bristol
BS15 8BE
- Phone:
- 01179478441
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window