OGLANDER ROMAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Oglander Roman Trust was created to preserve, protect and improve the site of Brading Roman Villa. The Villa is an example of a maritime courtyard villa with in situ mosaics of the 3rd century. It is an Ancient Scheduled Monument and grade 1 listed building set in an Area of Oustanding Natural Beauty on the Isle of Wight. The mission of the Trust is to conserve and develop the Villa site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 27 February 1995: Standard registration
- BRADING ROMAN VILLA (Working name)
- THE OGLANDER ROMAN TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEWART DALE WHITE | Chair | 14 May 2020 |
|
|||||
John Sandiford Haigh | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Jessica Suzanne Garbett | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Meirion Davies | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Robert Woodifield | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|||||
REV CANON DAVID MICHAEL LOW MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. A) THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS A NATIONAL MONUMENT OF ANY BUILDING OR BUILDINGS OF NATIONAL HISTORIC ARCHAEOLOGICAL ARTISTIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST AND IMPORTANCE SITUATED ON THE ISLE OF WIGHT INCLUDING ANY ANCILLARY BUILDINGS AS SHALL OR MAY AT ANY TIME BE VESTED IN THE CHARITY OR IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE ANY INTEREST. B) THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ANY AMENITY OR OTHER LAND SITUATED ON THE ISLE OF WIGHT AS SHALL OR MAY AT ANY TIME BE VESTED IN THE CHARITY OR IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE ANY INTEREST AND WHICH IS ASSOCIATED WITH ANY SUCH BUILDING OR BUILDINGS WHERE SUCH LAND IS OF SCIENTIFIC ARCHAEOLOGICAL AGRICULTURAL HORTICULTURAL OR SILVICULTURAL INTEREST. C) THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ALL FURNITURE PICTURES HISTORIC RECORDS BOOKS MANUSCRIPTS MUNIMENTS ARMOUR PORCELAIN SILVER AND GOLD OBJETS D'ART ARTEFACTS REMAINS AND OTHER CHATTELS OR ITEMS OF NATIONAL HISTORIC ARCHAEOLOGICAL ARTISTIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST ASSOCIATED WITH OR DISPLAYED IN ANY SUCH BUILDING OR BUILDINGS. D) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO AND THE STUDY OF SUCH BUILDINGS LAND FURNITURE PICTURES AND OTHER CHATTELS OR ITEMS BY MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC. E) THE CREATION MAINTENANCE AND FUNDING OF GRANT BURSARIES SCHOLARSHIPS PRIZES AND REWARDS FOR MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO INCREASE THEIR KNOWLEDGE APPRECIATION AND ENJOYMENT OF SUCH BUILDINGS LAND FURNITURE PICTURES AND OTHER CHATTELS OR ITEMS AND FOR EDUCATIONAL AND RESEARCH PURPOSES GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brading Roman Villa
Morton Old Road
Brading
SANDOWN
PO36 0PH
- Phone:
- 01983406223
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window