GOLDSMITHS CHORAL UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Goldsmiths Choral Union (GCU) seeks to promote the study, practice and performance of choral works including contemporary and little known works. It seeks to foster and broaden the knowlege and appreciation of such music and a varied programme of music is undertaken to enable as many people as possible to benefit through choir membership, choral workshops and concert attendance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Pierson | Chair | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Carter | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Pamela Corkill | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Ilias | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Dorothy Clugston | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret WARE MBE | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN STEPHENSON | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Arabella Stuart | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.69k | £80.19k | £55.32k | £68.71k | £89.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.41k | £58.33k | £14.47k | £93.77k | £91.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05 APRIL 2006 as amended on 02 Sep 2020 as amended on 12 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL WORKS AND OTHER MUSIC INCLUDING CONTEMPORARY AND LITTLE KNOWN WORKS AND TO FOSTER AND BROADEN THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC AMONG THE MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE AND OTHER ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LONDON AND HOME COUNTIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
GMAK Services
5/7 Vernon Yard
Portobello Road
LONDON
W11 2DX
- Phone:
- 07410629038
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window