CARISBROOKE C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We organise social activities to generate funds for equipment or facilites which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £4,839
Total expenditure: £3,409

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Isle Of Wight

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CARISBROOKE C E PRIMARY SCHOOL P T A (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fiona Elizabeth Hardy Chair 07 November 2019
1st Newport IW Scout Group (The Old Guard)
Received: On time
Abbey Angela Morgan Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
SARAH THORNE Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Leanne Proctor Trustee 07 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £4.97k £2.06k £173 £3.05k £4.84k
Total expenditure £3.80k £6.41k £862 £2.57k £3.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 27 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 19 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 August 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Carisbrooke C Of E Primary School
Wellington Road
NEWPORT
Isle Of Wight
PO30 5QT
Phone:
01983522348
Website:

No information available