Financial history OASIS CARE AND TRAINING AGENCY (OCTA)

Charity number: 1044521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.52m £9.14m £9.49m £10.58m £11.38m
Total expenditure £9.35m £9.04m £9.19m £10.38m £11.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £538.11k N/A N/A £70.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £1 £1
Income - Other trading activities £9.52m £9.13m £9.48m £9.97m £11.22m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £7.57k £444.74k £153.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.76k £5.64k £5.14k £516 £656
Income - Other £839 £7.29k £186 £160.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £1
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.00k £48.61k £1.50k £3.00k £6.75k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £9.34m £8.99m £9.19m £10.38m £11.32m