Financial history THURLBEAR SCHOOL PARENT - TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.76k £7.10k £11.80k £14.30k £12.14k
Total expenditure £14.67k £3.60k £5.23k £17.05k £15.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A