STAFFORD DISTRICT VOLUNTARY SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We assist the creation of new Civil Society organisations: voluntary & community groups, social enterprises & charities, as well as working with existing organisations and in local communities. We look to fill gaps in services, e.g.: social care, children & young people, health, employment, training & volunteering. We work strategically with both Public & Private Sectors on behalf of our Members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 24 February 1995: Standard registration
- 09 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 09 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1161077 SUPPORT STAFFORDSHIRE
- S D V S (Working name)
- SDVS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £489.96k | £483.70k | £326.83k | £458.95k | £341.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £364.21k | £528.11k | £574.27k | £460.83k | £355.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 13 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
13 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 21 February 2014 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 21 February 2014 | 21 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 05 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 05 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 1995, AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JULY 1997,19 APRIL 2005 AND 17TH OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE BOROUGH OF STAFFORD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE AND WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window