Financial history NOTTAGE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £8.20k £2.65k £6.84k £5.60k £8.80k
Total expenditure £15.17k £1.11k £7.92k £1.75k £16.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A