Financial history BODEDERN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1044538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.13k £15.23k £7.03k £3.06k £3.98k
Total expenditure £12.31k £4.87k £7.45k £4.59k £5.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.55k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A