BCM INTERNATIONAL UK (ANCHOR) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The work of BCM involves holding children's clubs in churches, schools and homes and holding camps. The ministry also includes organising holiday clubs, taking school assemblies, playgroups, teaching and preaching engagements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
360 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- Greece
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 02 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Girvan | Chair | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Abercrombie | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Rogers | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN THOMAS | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
STANLEY PAGET | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.87k | £81.35k | £43.54k | £64.75k | £67.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.78k | £110.03k | £70.55k | £94.32k | £98.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINE SET OUT IN THE SECOND SCHEDULE. FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE TRUST DEED DATED 11 JUNE 1994.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
214 Church Drive
Quedgeley
GLOUCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL2 4US
- Phone:
- 01452 546477
- Email:
- finance@bcm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window