Accounts and annual returns BCM INTERNATIONAL UK (CC) TRUST

Charity Number: 1044540
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 20 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 13 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 31 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 31 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 28 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 28 October 2005 On Time