MELROSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NON PROFIT COMMUNITY HALL, PROVIDING INDOOR SPACE FOR ALL THE COMMUNITIES NEEDS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £3,040 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Ann Fergurson | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhoda Anne Morson | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Toomer | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
EVADNE KEEBLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOUISE TUCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAOMI LAFFOLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.37k | £37.03k | £48.11k | £35.15k | £69.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.54k | £41.41k | £38.46k | £39.95k | £61.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £254.57k | £30.19k | £9.00k | £500 | £3.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1987 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BASINGSTOKE WITH THE EMPHASIS ON POPLEY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION, AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR ANY OTHER BODY NOMINATED BY THEM IN THE MAINTENANCE OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, BASINGSTOKE AND IN PARTICULAR THE ESTATE OF POPLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Melrose Community Association
597 Abbey Road
Popley
BASINGSTOKE
RG24 9ES
- Phone:
- 01256420676
- Email:
- MELROSEHALL2@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window