THE VOLUNTARY ACTION HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1044549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

VAHS exists to advance the historical understanding and analysis of voluntary action. We organise seminars and occasional conferences and have a membership of academics, practitioners and those interested in the subject.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,822
Total expenditure: £505

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Eleanor Munro Chair 23 September 2019
None on record
Dr George Gosling Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Dr Robert Piggott Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Paul Beard Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Mandy Barrie Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Marta Starostina Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Meta Elaine Zimmeck Trustee 05 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.96k £1.32k £943 £6.07k £6.82k
Total expenditure £2.26k £204 £512 £2.13k £505
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 June 2024 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 33
Queen Alexandra Mansions
Judd Street
London
WC1H 9DQ
Phone:
02078378735