Financial history THE FRIENDS OF MOULSHAM JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1044556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £12.20k £4.36k £28.65k £32.15k £26.18k
Total expenditure £5.36k £4.39k £12.76k £33.88k £39.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A