FRIENDS OF HOLY ROSARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1044579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General fundraising to provide additional equipment and resources for Holy Rosary Primary School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £10
Total expenditure: £687

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City
  • Sefton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Lakey Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
Paul Mcintyre Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record
Roisin Whelan Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record
Lisa Lakey Trustee 23 June 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £7.76k £1.92k £570 £4.09k £10
Total expenditure £5.05k £5.93k £6.46k £2.70k £687
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 06 January 2025 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 06 January 2025 403 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 01 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ORIEL DRIVE
AINTREE
LIVERPOOL
L10 6NJ
Phone:
07933 650803