BUXTON PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childcare facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £49,039 from 1 government contract(s) and £15,460 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 28 February 1995: Standard registration
- BUXTON PRESCHOOL (Working name)
- BUXTON PRESCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMBER PRESS | Chair | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Johnson | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Boore | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kay Burnett-Kiernan | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Lock | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Clarke | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Hutchings | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.43k | £51.44k | £70.28k | £85.80k | £76.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.78k | £60.35k | £67.41k | £81.77k | £77.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £43.47k | £54.29k | £62.28k | £49.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £2.28k | £795 | N/A | £15.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 AUGUST 1971, AS AMENDED 8TH JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE IN BUXTON (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
BUXTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Buxton Village Hall
Mill Street
Buxton
Norwich
NR10 5JE
- Phone:
- 01603279468
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window