Trustees THE FRIENDS OF HAPPISBURGH LIGHTHOUSE
Charity number: 1044590

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Guy Tweedale | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Turner | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Vyse | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Turner | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosalie Gibb | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN FORDYCE | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOY ELIZABETH TUBBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK JOHN TUBBY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.