THE COVENTRY MUSLIM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CMCA Ltd is a community resource centre providing advice and information on welfare rights, housing, immigration and nationality laws individual support sessions and advice on education, training and employment opportunities. Run adult education classes, sports and crafts activities (some for women only) ESOL, health promotion surgeries, creche and full day care nursery - social and cultural event
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £210,882 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 28 February 1995: Standard registration
- COVENTRY MUSLIM RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahmad kherallah | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohsin Mansur | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rabea Khan | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Goffar | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Blal Khan | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ferhan azad | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yakiya Minhas | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Afsar Hussain | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Idris Khan | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Munawar Mangara | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHAJAN ALI | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Taiba Khan | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
FAISAL ALI | Trustee | 22 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
GULAM SHABIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £377.02k | £303.11k | £389.19k | £435.24k | £443.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £431.78k | £365.00k | £371.69k | £501.45k | £465.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £168.39k | £140.22k | £163.90k | £158.70k | £210.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12TH NOVEMBER 1993 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 JANUARY 1995 AND 30 APRIL 1995.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COVENTRY IN PARTICULAR MUSLIMS BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION SO AS TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF COVENTRY, IN PARTICULAR MUSLIMS. B) TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE AND PRACTICE OF ISLAM FOR MUSLIMS AND TO PROMOTE A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THEIR WAY OF LIFE AMONGST OTHER INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING AREAS. C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY. D) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
COVENTRY MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE
RED LANE
COVENTRY
CV6 5EE
- Phone:
- 02476637933
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window