EAST DEVON MUSIC FESTIVAL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRESENTATION OF LIVE HIGH QUALITY MUSICAL AND VISUAL ARTS EVENTS IN HONITON AND DISTRICT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 28 February 1995: Standard registration
- EAST DEVON MUSIC (Working name)
- EAST DEVON MUSIC FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- EAST DEVON MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- HONITON FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- THE HONITON FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Reeks | Chair | 25 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Clive Anthony Potter | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Bowen | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|||||
IAN JEEVES | Trustee | 21 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266 | £34 | £629 | £1.11k | £2.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.50k | £1.35k | £7.35k | £5.30k | £4.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 21 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN HONITON AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO BROADEN THE RANGE OF EDUCATIONAL AND COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE MEDIA OF EXPRESSIVE AND PERFORMING ARTS
Area of benefit
HONITON AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Griffin Accountants
52 High Street
HONITON
Devon
EX14 1PQ
- Phone:
- 01404861404
- Email:
- eastdevonmusic@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window