Financial history TIBBERTON PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1044603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.46k £17.44k £7.79k £7.45k £5.53k
Total expenditure £9.11k £9.31k £9.97k £6.18k £6.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A