TIBBERTON PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds by various means such as Xmas & Summer Fayres, Bingo, Treasure Hunts, Sponsored walks and challenges, Recipe books etc. Involving staff, parents and children in the raising of these funds to be spent on various projects in the school to enhance the chidrens' environment and art and cultural activities within the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 01 March 1995: Standard registration
- TIBBERTON SCHOOL P T A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATIE JOAN HEATH | Chair | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Norton | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.46k | £17.44k | £7.79k | £7.45k | £5.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.11k | £9.31k | £9.97k | £6.18k | £6.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 26 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 22 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tibberton C Of E Primary School
Tibberton
NEWPORT
Shropshire
TF10 8NN
- Phone:
- 07903781003
- Email:
- katherinelnorton1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window