Governing document SUFFOLK AND NORTH ESSEX OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY GROUP
Charity number: 1044606

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APR 1965 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 1993 AS AMENDED ON 15 DEC 1994 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUL 2000 as amended on 18 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND SAFETY IN WORKPLACES (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO HEALTH AND SAFETY AT WORK
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE SUFFOLK AND NORTH ESSEX
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.