Financial history FRIENDS OF DISS HEALTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1044610
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £23.40k £581 £4.09k £5.65k £2.57k
Total expenditure £29.82k £10.88k £17.00k £13.30k £5.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A