ST MARKS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

All parents of children attending St. Mark's CE Primary School in Cold Ash are automatically members of the School Association. A small number of volunteers drawn from this group are named Trustees who meet regularly to plan fundraising activities to benefit the school such as the Christmas Fayre, quiz nights, school discos, textile collections and the Summer Fete.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £29,755
Total expenditure: £23,515

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laurence Grew Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £25.11k £20.08k £31.70k £29.48k £29.76k
Total expenditure £29.76k £19.44k £36.37k £27.91k £23.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 20 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 21 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marks C of E School
Hermitage Road. Cold Ash Hill
Cold Ash
THATCHAM
RG18 9PT
Phone:
01635 862600
Email:
No information available