Accounts and annual returns THELWALL JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required